Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Disabled (O3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 /CH0094
Title
St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Requirements
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1277
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Ammunition - Developmental Disabilities Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460 (SB1010)
Title
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1460)
Title
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and Services
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0257 /CH0094 St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Requirements St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1277 Sales and Use Tax - Ammunition - Developmental Disabilities Funding Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1460 (SB1010) Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and Services Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1010 (HB1460) Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and Services Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM