Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Disabled (O3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128 /CH0211
Title
State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256
Title
Adult Protective Services - Investigation - Time Period Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0448 /CH0132 (SB0344/CH0133)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Account Clarifications
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769 /CH0068 (SB0216/CH0067)
Title
Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0971 (SB0872/CH0612)
Title
James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1613 (SB0876)
Title
Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1645
Title
Task Force to Study Mental Health Concerns for Deaf and Hard of Hearing Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216 /CH0067 (HB0769/CH0068)
Title
Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0133 (HB0448/CH0132)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Account Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444
Title
Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 /CH0612 (HB0971)
Title
James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB1613)
Title
Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0128 /CH0211 State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0256 Adult Protective Services - Investigation - Time Period Increase Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0448 /CH0132 (SB0344/CH0133) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Account Clarifications Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0769 /CH0068 (SB0216/CH0067) Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0971 (SB0872/CH0612) James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1613 (SB0876) Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act) Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1645 Task Force to Study Mental Health Concerns for Deaf and Hard of Hearing Individuals Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0216 /CH0067 (HB0769/CH0068) Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0344 /CH0133 (HB0448/CH0132) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Account Clarifications Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0444 Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0872 /CH0612 (HB0971) James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0876 (HB1613) Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM