Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Disabled (O3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 /CH0390 (SB0550/CH0391)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
First Responders - Mandatory Autism Training
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Prader-Willi Syndrome
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1206
Title
Department of Information Technology - Remote Access Information Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1618 (SB0939)
Title
Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0482
Title
Remote Access Information Program for Deaf-Blind Individuals - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 /CH0391 (HB0782/CH0390)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1618)
Title
Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013
Title
First Responders - Mandatory Autism Training
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0782 /CH0390 (SB0550/CH0391) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0944 First Responders - Mandatory Autism Training Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Prader-Willi Syndrome Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1206 Department of Information Technology - Remote Access Information Program - Establishment Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1618 (SB0939) Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act) Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0482 Remote Access Information Program for Deaf-Blind Individuals - Establishment Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 /CH0391 (HB0782/CH0390) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0939 (HB1618) Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1013 First Responders - Mandatory Autism Training Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM