Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Disabled (O3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 (SB0550)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit for Disabled Individuals - State Supplement
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 /CH0475 (SB0752)
Title
Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0700)
Title
Home- and Community-Based Services Waivers - Alterations (Laurie's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB0226)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit for Disabled Individuals - State Supplement
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB1009)
Title
Home- and Community-Based Services Waivers - Alterations (Laurie's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB0838/CH0475)
Title
Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0226 (SB0550) Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit for Disabled Individuals - State Supplement Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0838 /CH0475 (SB0752) Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Appropriations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1009 (SB0700) Home- and Community-Based Services Waivers - Alterations (Laurie's Law) Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0550 (HB0226) Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit for Disabled Individuals - State Supplement Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0700 (HB1009) Home- and Community-Based Services Waivers - Alterations (Laurie's Law) Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Motion to refer to Budget and Taxation (Senator King) Adopted
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0752 (HB0838/CH0475) Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM