Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Disabled (O3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396
Title
Child Care Centers – Early Childhood Screening and Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475
Title
Community Colleges - Students With Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 /CH0315 (SB0640/CH0316)
Title
Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0771 /CH0319 (SB0158)
Title
Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 /CH0341
Title
State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 (SB0851/CH0586)
Title
Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1109 (SB0109)
Title
Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163 (SB0642)
Title
Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Alterations and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1471
Title
Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Delegation of Responsibilities - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 (HB1109)
Title
Property Tax Exemption – Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses – Refund
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158 (HB0771/CH0319)
Title
Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0316 (HB0760/CH0315)
Title
Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 (HB1163)
Title
Home– and Community–Based Waiver Services – Study and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 /CH0586 (HB1003)
Title
Human Services – Department of Disabilities – Accessibility Programs
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0396 Child Care Centers – Early Childhood Screening and Assistance Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0475 Community Colleges - Students With Disabilities Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0760 /CH0315 (SB0640/CH0316) Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments Delegate Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 315
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0771 /CH0319 (SB0158) Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height Delegate Reilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 319
Economic Matters
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0847 /CH0341 State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs Delegate Guyton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 341
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 (SB0851/CH0586) Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1109 (SB0109) Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 (SB0642) Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Alterations and Task Force Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1471 Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Delegation of Responsibilities - Limitation Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
SB0109 (HB1109) Property Tax Exemption – Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses – Refund Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0158 (HB0771/CH0319) Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Special Order until end of this calendar (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Finance
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0640 /CH0316 (HB0760/CH0315) Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 316
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0642 (HB1163) Home– and Community–Based Waiver Services – Study and Task Force Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0851 /CH0586 (HB1003) Human Services – Department of Disabilities – Accessibility Programs Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:28 PM