Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Children (O4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428 /CH0114
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reports and Records - Disclosure to Public Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433 (SB0412)
Title
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 /CH0545 (SB0764/CH0544)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 (SB0570)
Title
Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and Discipline
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460 (SB1010)
Title
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412 (HB0433)
Title
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 (HB0897)
Title
Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764 /CH0544 (HB0823/CH0545)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1460)
Title
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and Services
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0428 /CH0114 Child Abuse and Neglect - Reports and Records - Disclosure to Public Institutions of Higher Education Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0433 (SB0412) Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0823 /CH0545 (SB0764/CH0544) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Appropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0897 (SB0570) Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and Discipline Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1460 (SB1010) Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and Services Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0412 (HB0433) Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0442 Residential Child Care Programs - Memorandum of Understanding Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0570 (HB0897) Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and Discipline Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0764 /CH0544 (HB0823/CH0545) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1010 (HB1460) Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and Services Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM