Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Children (O4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 (SB0332/CH0002)
Title
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428 /CH0404
Title
Children - Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577 (SB1018)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904 /CH0621
Title
Children, Youth, and Family Services - Local Management Boards and State Spending - Information Collection and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 (SB0914)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 /CH0332 (SB0716/CH0331)
Title
Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284 (SB0685/CH0190)
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Provision of Information to Health Care Practitioners
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307 /CH0451
Title
Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Annual Notice of Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1344
Title
Task Force on Preventing Child Sexual Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1522 /CH0461 (SB1107)
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0332 /CH0002 (HB0297)
Title
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685 /CH0190 (HB1284)
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Provision of Information to Health Care Practitioners
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 /CH0331 (HB1276/CH0332)
Title
Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 (HB1270)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1018 (HB0577)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1107 (HB1522/CH0461)
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0297 (SB0332/CH0002) Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0428 /CH0404 Children - Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program - Eligibility Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0577 (SB1018) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0904 /CH0621 Children, Youth, and Family Services - Local Management Boards and State Spending - Information Collection and Report Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1270 (SB0914) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1276 /CH0332 (SB0716/CH0331) Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1284 (SB0685/CH0190) Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Provision of Information to Health Care Practitioners Delegate Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1307 /CH0451 Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Annual Notice of Benefits Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1344 Task Force on Preventing Child Sexual Abuse Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1522 /CH0461 (SB1107) Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0332 /CH0002 (HB0297) Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0685 /CH0190 (HB1284) Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Provision of Information to Health Care Practitioners Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0716 /CH0331 (HB1276/CH0332) Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Senator Reilly 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0914 (HB1270) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1018 (HB0577) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1107 (HB1522/CH0461) Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM