Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Children (O4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0088
Title
Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0089
Title
Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program - Composition
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329 /CH0184 (SB0312/CH0183)
Title
Children - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Advertising and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668 /CH0684 (SB0584/CH0683)
Title
Preschool Development Grants - Expansion Grants - Required State Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0772 (SB0262)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095 (SB0369/CH0067)
Title
Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1391
Title
Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1402 /CH0032 (SB1125)
Title
Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1424
Title
Regulation of Youth Sports - Ice Hockey Clubs - Noncontact League
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465
Title
Foster Care - Standards for Foster Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1501
Title
Governor's Office for Children - Family Navigators Program
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079 /CH0045
Title
State Citizens Review Board for Children - Penalties for Unauthorized Disclosure of Child Protection Case Information
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102
Title
Governor's Office for Children and Services to Children
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB0772)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0312 /CH0183 (HB0329/CH0184)
Title
Children - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Advertising and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0369 /CH0067 (HB1095)
Title
Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0584 /CH0683 (HB0668/CH0684)
Title
Preschool Development Grants - Expansion Grants - Required State Funding
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1125 (HB1402/CH0032)
Title
Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 /CH0088 Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0067 /CH0089 Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program - Composition Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Ways and Means
1/28/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0329 /CH0184 (SB0312/CH0183) Children - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Advertising and Penalties Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0668 /CH0684 (SB0584/CH0683) Preschool Development Grants - Expansion Grants - Required State Funding Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0772 (SB0262) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1095 (SB0369/CH0067) Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social Services Delegate Platt 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1391 Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1402 /CH0032 (SB1125) Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement Act Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1424 Regulation of Youth Sports - Ice Hockey Clubs - Noncontact League Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1465 Foster Care - Standards for Foster Parents Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1501 Governor's Office for Children - Family Navigators Program Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0079 /CH0045 State Citizens Review Board for Children - Penalties for Unauthorized Disclosure of Child Protection Case Information Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0102 Governor's Office for Children and Services to Children Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance (Senator Conway) Adopted
Finance
1/20/2016 - 3:00 PM
SB0262 (HB0772) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0312 /CH0183 (HB0329/CH0184) Children - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Advertising and Penalties Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0369 /CH0067 (HB1095) Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social Services Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0584 /CH0683 (HB0668/CH0684) Preschool Development Grants - Expansion Grants - Required State Funding Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 683
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 3:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1125 (HB1402/CH0032) Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement Act Senator Ferguson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM