Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Children (O4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 (SB0490/CH0497)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524 /CH0815 (SB0291/CH0816)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0806
Title
Education - Summer Meals Expansion Grant Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941 /CH0396
Title
Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1476
Title
Education - Supplemental Prekindergarten Grant - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1501
Title
Hospitals - Education - Child Safety Seat Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1517 /CH0693 (SB0977/CH0692)
Title
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1577
Title
Human Services - Family Navigation Services - Provision and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1589
Title
Maryland Office for Refugees and Asylees - Placement Information (Unaccompanied Alien Children Placement Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1610
Title
State–Occupied Buildings – Child Care Centers – Requirements and Renovations
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1685 /CH0558 (SB0912/CH0559)
Title
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1747 /CH0799
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exceptions
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085 /CH0369
Title
Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 /CH0816 (HB0524/CH0815)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412
Title
Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490 /CH0497 (HB0454)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 /CH0559 (HB1685/CH0558)
Title
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0977 /CH0692 (HB1517/CH0693)
Title
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Reports
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0454 (SB0490/CH0497) Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information Delegate Moon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0524 /CH0815 (SB0291/CH0816) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0806 Education - Summer Meals Expansion Grant Pilot Program Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0941 /CH0396 Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – Eligibility Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1476 Education - Supplemental Prekindergarten Grant - Eligibility Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1501 Hospitals - Education - Child Safety Seat Requirements Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1517 /CH0693 (SB0977/CH0692) Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Reports Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 693
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1577 Human Services - Family Navigation Services - Provision and Funding Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1589 Maryland Office for Refugees and Asylees - Placement Information (Unaccompanied Alien Children Placement Transparency Act) Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1610 State–Occupied Buildings – Child Care Centers – Requirements and Renovations Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1685 /CH0558 (SB0912/CH0559) Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund) Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1747 /CH0799 Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exceptions Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 799
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0085 /CH0369 Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0291 /CH0816 (HB0524/CH0815) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0412 Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services Oversight Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 /CH0497 (HB0454) Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 /CH0559 (HB1685/CH0558) Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund) Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0977 /CH0692 (HB1517/CH0693) Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Reports Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692
Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM