Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Children (O4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 /CH0635 (SB0218/CH0636)
Title
Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520 /CH0661 (SB0406/CH0662)
Title
Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 /CH0553 (SB0930)
Title
Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1283 (SB0732/CH0304)
Title
Child in Need of Assistance - Guardianship by Local Department - ABLE Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0218 /CH0636 (HB0338/CH0635)
Title
Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0406 /CH0662 (HB0520/CH0661)
Title
Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination – Grant Funding and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732 /CH0304 (HB1283)
Title
Child in Need of Assistance – Guardianship by Local Department – Financial Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930 (HB0911/CH0553)
Title
Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0338 /CH0635 (SB0218/CH0636) Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act) Delegate Queen 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0520 /CH0661 (SB0406/CH0662) Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
HB0911 /CH0553 (SB0930) Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1283 (SB0732/CH0304) Child in Need of Assistance - Guardianship by Local Department - ABLE Accounts Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0218 /CH0636 (HB0338/CH0635) Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act) Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 636
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0406 /CH0662 (HB0520/CH0661) Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination – Grant Funding and Task Force Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0732 /CH0304 (HB1283) Child in Need of Assistance – Guardianship by Local Department – Financial Accounts Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0930 (HB0911/CH0553) Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors Senator Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM