Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Oaths

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 /CH0089
Title
Correctional Services - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Subpoena Power
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 (SB0794)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0806 /CH0391
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 (SB0783)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255
Title
Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1268
Title
Official Oaths - Educational Course Requirement (Maryland Oath of Office Affirmation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dwyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291 (SB0554)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB1291)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Senator Conway
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 (HB1029)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB0576)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0244 /CH0089 Correctional Services - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Subpoena Power Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0576 (SB0794) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0806 /CH0391 Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1029 (SB0783) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Delegate Hammen 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1255 Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1268 Official Oaths - Educational Course Requirement (Maryland Oath of Office Affirmation Act) Delegate Dwyer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 (SB0554) Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB1291) Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Senator Conway 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0783 (HB1029) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 (HB0576) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM