Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Oaths

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0468 (SB0465/CH0036)
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 (SB0752)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022 (SB0609)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067
Title
Public Service Commission - Membership - Selection and Term
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145 (SB0903)
Title
State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 /CH0036 (HB0468)
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609 (HB1022)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB0993)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903 (HB1145)
Title
State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0468 (SB0465/CH0036) Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company Delegate Jameson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0985 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 (SB0752) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1022 (SB0609) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Establishment Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1067 Public Service Commission - Membership - Selection and Term Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1101 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1145 (SB0903) State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0465 /CH0036 (HB0468) Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Finance
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0609 (HB1022) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0616 Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0752 (HB0993) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0903 (HB1145) State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM