Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Oaths

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 /CH0091 (SB0819/CH0090)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 (SB0747)
Title
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037 /CH0598 (SB0166)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403 (SB0409)
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 /CH0041
Title
Title Insurance Producers - Licensing of Business Entities and On-Site Reviews
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164
Title
Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409 (HB1403)
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Baltimore City Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB0939)
Title
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819 /CH0090 (HB0729/CH0091)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1020
Title
Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0729 /CH0091 (SB0819/CH0090) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and Duties Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0939 (SB0747) State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1037 /CH0598 (SB0166) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1403 (SB0409) Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 /CH0041 Title Insurance Producers - Licensing of Business Entities and On-Site Reviews Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0164 Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0409 (HB1403) Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Baltimore City Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0747 (HB0939) State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0819 /CH0090 (HB0729/CH0091) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and Duties Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials Charles County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1020 Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017 Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM