Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Obscenity -see also- Nudity & Sexual Displays; Pornography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1348 (SB1078)
Title
Medical Cannabis - Advertising - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904
Title
Public Schools – Social Media Use by Educators
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1078 (HB1348)
Title
Medical Cannabis – Advertising – Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1348 (SB1078) Medical Cannabis - Advertising - Restrictions Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0904 Public Schools – Social Media Use by Educators Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1078 (HB1348) Medical Cannabis – Advertising – Restrictions Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM