Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Occupational Safety

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Occupational Safety and Health - Good Faith Actions by Business Owners - Penalty Forgiveness
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 (SB0305/CH0224)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0330 (SB0555)
Title
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795 /CH0539 (SB0757/CH0538)
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - Complaints
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1486
Title
Procurement - Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification
Sponsor
Delegate McHale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555 (HB0330)
Title
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0757 /CH0538 (HB0795/CH0539)
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - Complaints
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Occupational Safety and Health - Good Faith Actions by Business Owners - Penalty Forgiveness Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0296 (SB0305/CH0224) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0330 (SB0555) Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Exemption Delegate Serafini 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0795 /CH0539 (SB0757/CH0538) Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - Complaints Delegate Hucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1486 Procurement - Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Delegate McHale 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Finance
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0555 (HB0330) Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0757 /CH0538 (HB0795/CH0539) Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - Complaints Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Finance
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page