Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Occupational Safety

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 /CH0549 (SB0711/CH0548)
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and Accessibility
Sponsor
Delegate Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710 (SB0483/CH0510)
Title
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 (SB0669/CH0189)
Title
Procurement - Debarment - Violations of Law
Sponsor
Delegate Turner, V.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0951 /CH0625 (SB0774)
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate McHale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Workers' Compensation - Exclusivity of Compensation - Exception - Deliberate Act of Employer
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130 /CH0038
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry and Workers' Compensation Commission - Reports of Accidental Injury or Disability - Electronic Sharing
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 /CH0510 (HB0710)
Title
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 /CH0189 (HB0796)
Title
Procurement - Debarment - Violations of Law
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0711 /CH0548 (HB0189/CH0549)
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and Accessibility
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 (HB0951/CH0625)
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0189 /CH0549 (SB0711/CH0548) Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and Accessibility Delegate Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0710 (SB0483/CH0510) Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program Delegate Cullison 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0796 (SB0669/CH0189) Procurement - Debarment - Violations of Law Delegate Turner, V. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0951 /CH0625 (SB0774) Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements Delegate McHale 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1289 Workers' Compensation - Exclusivity of Compensation - Exception - Deliberate Act of Employer Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0130 /CH0038 Commissioner of Labor and Industry and Workers' Compensation Commission - Reports of Accidental Injury or Disability - Electronic Sharing Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Finance
1/09/2014 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0483 /CH0510 (HB0710) Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0669 /CH0189 (HB0796) Procurement - Debarment - Violations of Law Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0711 /CH0548 (HB0189/CH0549) Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and Accessibility Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0774 (HB0951/CH0625) Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM