Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Occupational Safety

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053 (SB0174)
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission - Location of Hearings - Claims Filed by Employees of Governmental Agencies
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174 (HB1053)
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission - Location of Hearings - Claims Filed by Employees of Governmental Agencies
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 /CH0669 (HB0505/CH0670)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1082
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669) Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0977 Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1053 (SB0174) Workers' Compensation Commission - Location of Hearings - Claims Filed by Employees of Governmental Agencies Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0101 Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0174 (HB1053) Workers' Compensation Commission - Location of Hearings - Claims Filed by Employees of Governmental Agencies Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0390 /CH0669 (HB0505/CH0670) Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1082 State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM