Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Occupational Safety

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 (SB0400)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1510
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 (HB1172)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818 /CH0517
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Voluntary Protection Program
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1172 (SB0400) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
Finance
HB1510 Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0400 (HB1172) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0818 /CH0517 Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Voluntary Protection Program Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM