Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ocean City

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122 (SB0132/CH0051)
Title
Critical Area Commission for the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays - Membership From Ocean City
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1367 (SB0970)
Title
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132 /CH0051 (HB0122)
Title
Critical Area Commission for the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays - Membership From Ocean City
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0970 (HB1367)
Title
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0122 (SB0132/CH0051) Critical Area Commission for the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays - Membership From Ocean City Delegate Stein 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1367 (SB0970) Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0132 /CH0051 (HB0122) Critical Area Commission for the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays - Membership From Ocean City Senator Mathias 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0970 (HB1367) Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM