Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Off-Road Vehicles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420 (SB0471/CH0505)
Title
Washington County - Off-Road Vehicle Trails - Prohibition of Establishment on Sideling Hill
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 /CH0607 (SB0533)
Title
Forests and Parks - Public Recreation on Private and State-Owned Land - Off-Highway Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1150 (SB0080)
Title
All-Terrain Vehicles - Protective Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 (HB1150)
Title
All-Terrain Vehicles - Protective Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 /CH0505 (HB0420)
Title
Washington County - Off-Road Vehicle Trails - Prohibition of Establishment on Sideling Hill
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533 (HB0660/CH0607)
Title
Forests and Parks - Public Recreation on Private and State-Owned Land - Off-Highway Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0420 (SB0471/CH0505) Washington County - Off-Road Vehicle Trails - Prohibition of Establishment on Sideling Hill Delegate Myers 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0660 /CH0607 (SB0533) Forests and Parks - Public Recreation on Private and State-Owned Land - Off-Highway Vehicles Delegate Myers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1150 (SB0080) All-Terrain Vehicles - Protective Equipment Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
SB0080 (HB1150) All-Terrain Vehicles - Protective Equipment Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0471 /CH0505 (HB0420) Washington County - Off-Road Vehicle Trails - Prohibition of Establishment on Sideling Hill Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0533 (HB0660/CH0607) Forests and Parks - Public Recreation on Private and State-Owned Land - Off-Highway Vehicles Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM