Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Ophthalmologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160 /CH0576 (SB0904/CH0575)
Title
Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904 /CH0575 (HB1160/CH0576)
Title
Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1160 /CH0576 (SB0904/CH0575) Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider Contracts Delegate Kach 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0904 /CH0575 (HB1160/CH0576) Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider Contracts Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page