Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Opioids -see also- Controlled Dangerous Substances; Drugs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - Office of the Chief Medical Examiner
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0464 (SB0990)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611 (SB1053)
Title
Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0674
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Schedules
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1166
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Diversion Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1378
Title
Criminal Law - Opioids - Distribution Causing Death of Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1440 (SB0705)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program - Opioid Treatment Program Patients
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1516
Title
Washington County - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Program - Prohibition on Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518
Title
Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application - Pilot Program (I'm Alive Today App)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1654
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Prescribers of Opioids - Notification Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Abuse Assessment and Treatment
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520
Title
Behavioral Health Programs - Opioid Treatment Services - Limitation on Licenses
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521
Title
Behavioral Health - Opioid Treatment Services Programs - Medical Director
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB1440)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – Disabled Reduced Fare Program – Opioid Treatment Program Patients
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0990 (HB0464)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1053 (HB0611)
Title
Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0422 Opioid Restitution Fund - Office of the Chief Medical Examiner Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0464 (SB0990) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0611 (SB1053) Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0674 Controlled Dangerous Substances - Schedules Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1166 Public Safety - Law Enforcement Diversion Programs Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1378 Criminal Law - Opioids - Distribution Causing Death of Minor Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1440 (SB0705) Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program - Opioid Treatment Program Patients Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1516 Washington County - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Program - Prohibition on Establishment Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1518 Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application - Pilot Program (I'm Alive Today App) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1654 Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Prescribers of Opioids - Notification Requirement Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0255 Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Abuse Assessment and Treatment Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0520 Behavioral Health Programs - Opioid Treatment Services - Limitation on Licenses Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0521 Behavioral Health - Opioid Treatment Services Programs - Medical Director Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 (HB1440) Maryland Transit Administration – Disabled Reduced Fare Program – Opioid Treatment Program Patients Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0990 (HB0464) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1053 (HB0611) Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:05 PM