Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Optometrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 /CH0437 (SB0198)
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190 (SB0811)
Title
Health Insurance and Discount Medical Plans - Vision Care Services and Materials
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 (HB0580/CH0437)
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 /CH0363
Title
Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 (HB1190)
Title
Health Insurance and Discount Medical Plans - Vision Care Services and Materials
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0547 Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0580 /CH0437 (SB0198) Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1190 (SB0811) Health Insurance and Discount Medical Plans - Vision Care Services and Materials Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0198 (HB0580/CH0437) Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 /CH0363 Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0811 (HB1190) Health Insurance and Discount Medical Plans - Vision Care Services and Materials Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM