Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Optometrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471 /CH0344 (SB0447)
Title
Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0436
Title
Child Support - Extraordinary Medical Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835 (SB0565)
Title
Health Occupations - Practice of Optometry - Therapeutically Certified Optometrists
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1252
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland's Future
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 (HB0471/CH0344)
Title
Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565 (HB0835)
Title
Health Occupations - Practice of Optometry - Therapeutically Certified Optometrists
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0471 /CH0344 (SB0447) Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0742 /CH0436 Child Support - Extraordinary Medical Expenses Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0835 (SB0565) Health Occupations - Practice of Optometry - Therapeutically Certified Optometrists Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1252 Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771) The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Ways and Means
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0447 (HB0471/CH0344) Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0565 (HB0835) Health Occupations - Practice of Optometry - Therapeutically Certified Optometrists Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413) The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 4:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM