Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Optometrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072
Title
Prince George's County - County Income Tax - Credit for Primary and Specialty Health Care Providers
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375
Title
Public School Students - Vision Services and the Vision for Maryland Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1557
Title
Public Schools - Health Services - County Boards of Education and Health Departments
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1064)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 /CH0501
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 (HB1648)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1072 Prince George's County - County Income Tax - Credit for Primary and Specialty Health Care Providers Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1375 Public School Students - Vision Services and the Vision for Maryland Program Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1557 Public Schools - Health Services - County Boards of Education and Health Departments Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1648 (SB1064) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0023 /CH0501 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1064 (HB1648) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:20 PM