Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Organ Donorship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164 /CH0084
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Regulatory Authority - Permit and Licensing Renewals and Building Plan Reviews
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171 (SB0040)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Organ Donation - Presumed Consent (Patricia Hanberry Gift of Life Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912 (SB0768)
Title
Driver Education Program - Classroom Instruction - Organ, Eye, and Tissue Donation Education
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311
Title
Crimes - Trafficking of Human Organs - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 (HB0171)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Organ Donation - Presumed Consent (Patricia Hanberry Gift of Life Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0768 (HB0912)
Title
Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0164 /CH0084 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Regulatory Authority - Permit and Licensing Renewals and Building Plan Reviews Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0171 (SB0040) Motor Vehicle Administration - Organ Donation - Presumed Consent (Patricia Hanberry Gift of Life Act) Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0912 (SB0768) Driver Education Program - Classroom Instruction - Organ, Eye, and Tissue Donation Education Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1311 Crimes - Trafficking of Human Organs - Penalties Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0040 (HB0171) Motor Vehicle Administration - Organ Donation - Presumed Consent (Patricia Hanberry Gift of Life Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0768 (HB0912) Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2013 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM