Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Organ Donorship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 (SB0813/CH0343)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Drivers' Licenses and Identification Cards - Organ Donor Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187
Title
Crimes - Trafficking of Human Organs - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1466
Title
Morticians and Funeral Directors - Contracts - Statement Regarding Availability of Internal Organs for Burial
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1555
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Perfusion Act - Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 /CH0343 (HB0529)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Drivers' Licenses and Identification Cards - Organ Donor Designation
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0529 (SB0813/CH0343) Motor Vehicle Administration - Drivers' Licenses and Identification Cards - Organ Donor Designation Delegate Malone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1187 Crimes - Trafficking of Human Organs - Penalties Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1466 Morticians and Funeral Directors - Contracts - Statement Regarding Availability of Internal Organs for Burial Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1555 Health Occupations - Maryland Perfusion Act - Applicability Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 /CH0343 (HB0529) Motor Vehicle Administration - Drivers' Licenses and Identification Cards - Organ Donor Designation Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM