Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Organ Donorship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0118
Title
Task Force to Study Presumed Consent Organ Donation in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592 (SB0415/CH0348)
Title
State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0792/CH0383)
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 /CH0348 (HB0592)
Title
State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122)
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0118 Task Force to Study Presumed Consent Organ Donation in Maryland Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0592 (SB0415/CH0348) State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act) Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1122 (SB0792/CH0383) Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0415 /CH0348 (HB0592) State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122) Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM