Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Organ Donorship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096 /CH0036
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Living Organ Donors
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 /CH0186 (SB0475/CH0187)
Title
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0123
Title
Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442
Title
Education – Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction in Public and Nonpublic High Schools
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0691 /CH0444
Title
Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund - Donor Registry - Annual Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0475 /CH0187 (HB0106/CH0186)
Title
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0096 /CH0036 Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Living Organ Donors Delegate Busch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Ways and Means
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0106 /CH0186 (SB0475/CH0187) Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles Delegate Busch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0123 Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery Vehicles Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0442 Education – Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction in Public and Nonpublic High Schools Delegate Queen 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0691 /CH0444 Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund - Donor Registry - Annual Funding Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0475 /CH0187 (HB0106/CH0186) Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM