Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Orphans' Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0168/CH0196)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163 (SB0172)
Title
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' Court
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515 (SB0327)
Title
Elections for Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Officials - Salaries
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0558 (SB0814/CH0557)
Title
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0910
Title
Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024
Title
Employees' Pension System - Elected or Appointed Officials - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407 /CH0153
Title
Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Ho. Co. 12-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 /CH0196 (HB0008)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 (HB0163)
Title
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' Court
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0327 (HB0515)
Title
Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Courts - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 /CH0522
Title
Employees' Pension System - Elected or Appointed Officials - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 /CH0557 (HB0720/CH0558)
Title
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931 /CH0335
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0168/CH0196) Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits Delegate Vitale 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0163 (SB0172) Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' Court Anne Arundel County Delegation 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 PM
HB0515 (SB0327) Elections for Judges - Nonpartisan Elections Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0520 St. Mary's County - Public Officials - Salaries St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0720 /CH0558 (SB0814/CH0557) Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0910 Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1024 Employees' Pension System - Elected or Appointed Officials - Membership Delegate McDermott 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2013 - 9:00 AM
HB1400 Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Baltimore County Delegation 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1407 /CH0153 Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Ho. Co. 12-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0168 /CH0196 (HB0008) Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 (HB0163) Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' Court Anne Arundel County Senators 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0327 (HB0515) Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Courts - Nonpartisan Elections Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0674 /CH0522 Employees' Pension System - Elected or Appointed Officials - Membership Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0814 /CH0557 (HB0720/CH0558) Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0931 /CH0335 Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM