Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Orphans' Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0211 (SB0556/CH0179)
Title
Carroll County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0570 (SB0621)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented Estate
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0321/CH0291)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0705 (SB0940/CH0207)
Title
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914 /CH0243
Title
Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0946)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 /CH0357 (SB0897/CH0356)
Title
Frederick County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1206 /CH0247 (SB0967)
Title
Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary and Pension
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390 /CH0454
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Officials - Salaries
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436
Title
Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan Participation
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1552 /CH0110
Title
Wicomico County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salaries
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319
Title
Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321 /CH0291 (HB0656)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 /CH0179 (HB0211)
Title
Carroll County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 /CH0310
Title
Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan Participation
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621 (HB0570)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented Estate
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0897 /CH0356 (HB1112/CH0357)
Title
Frederick County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0936 /CH0206
Title
Cecil County - Sheriff and Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940 /CH0207 (HB0705)
Title
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946 (HB1089)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary and Pension
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967 (HB1206/CH0247)
Title
Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary and Pension
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0211 (SB0556/CH0179) Carroll County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0570 (SB0621) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented Estate Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0656 (SB0321/CH0291) Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Delegate Ready 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0705 (SB0940/CH0207) Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0914 /CH0243 Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 (SB0946) Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Anne Arundel County Delegation 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1112 /CH0357 (SB0897/CH0356) Frederick County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1206 /CH0247 (SB0967) Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary and Pension Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1390 /CH0454 St. Mary's County - Public Officials - Salaries St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1436 Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan Participation Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1552 /CH0110 Wicomico County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salaries Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Judiciary
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0319 Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - Procedures Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0321 /CH0291 (HB0656) Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Senator Getty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 /CH0179 (HB0211) Carroll County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0612 /CH0310 Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan Participation Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0621 (HB0570) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented Estate Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0897 /CH0356 (HB1112/CH0357) Frederick County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Senator Brinkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0936 /CH0206 Cecil County - Sheriff and Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 /CH0207 (HB0705) Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0946 (HB1089) Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary and Pension Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
SB0967 (HB1206/CH0247) Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary and Pension Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM