Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Orphans' Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 /CH0292
Title
Cecil County - Orphans' Court - Sessions
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1013
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Orphans' Court Judges - Election and Term Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 (SB0831)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257
Title
Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate Court
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831 (HB1180)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0981 /CH0292 Cecil County - Orphans' Court - Sessions Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1013 Constitutional Amendment - Orphans' Court Judges - Election and Term Limits Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1180 (SB0831) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Baltimore County Delegation 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate Court Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0831 (HB1180) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Baltimore County Senators 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM