Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Orphans' Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008
Title
Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of Delivery
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087 (SB0156)
Title
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629 /CH0079 (SB0211/CH0078)
Title
Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722 (SB0881)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160
Title
Baltimore County - Judges - Nonpartisan Elections (Baltimore County Voting Rights Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0156 (HB0087)
Title
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 /CH0078 (HB0629/CH0079)
Title
Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0454
Title
Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB0722)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of Delivery Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0087 (SB0156) Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0629 /CH0079 (SB0211/CH0078) Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0722 (SB0881) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1160 Baltimore County - Judges - Nonpartisan Elections (Baltimore County Voting Rights Act) Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0156 (HB0087) Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0211 /CH0078 (HB0629/CH0079) Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 /CH0454 Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB0722) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM