Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Orphans' Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225 /CH0807 (SB0173/CH0808)
Title
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550 /CH0819
Title
Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0167 (SB0486/CH0168)
Title
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0649)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 /CH0838
Title
Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 /CH0808 (HB0225/CH0807)
Title
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 /CH0168 (HB0720/CH0167)
Title
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 (HB0777)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0225 /CH0807 (SB0173/CH0808) Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0550 /CH0819 Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 819
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0720 /CH0167 (SB0486/CH0168) Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0777 (SB0649) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1247 /CH0838 Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0173 /CH0808 (HB0225/CH0807) Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 808
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 /CH0168 (HB0720/CH0167) Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0649 (HB0777) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM