Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Orphans' Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247 /CH0130 (SB0149/CH0131)
Title
Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 /CH0220 (SB0714/CH0221)
Title
Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518 (SB0596)
Title
Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149 /CH0131 (HB0247/CH0130)
Title
Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 (HB0518)
Title
Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 /CH0221 (HB0490/CH0220)
Title
Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0247 /CH0130 (SB0149/CH0131) Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures Delegate Malone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 130
Judiciary
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0339 Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0490 /CH0220 (SB0714/CH0221) Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 220
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0518 (SB0596) Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0149 /CH0131 (HB0247/CH0130) Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 131
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0596 (HB0518) Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0714 /CH0221 (HB0490/CH0220) Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 221
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:55 PM