Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Overtime

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 (SB0405/CH0046)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Overtime Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1204 (SB0683)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0405 /CH0046 (HB0127)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Overtime Wages
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB1204)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0127 (SB0405/CH0046) Labor and Employment - Payment of Overtime Wages Delegate Davis 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1204 (SB0683) Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0405 /CH0046 (HB0127) Labor and Employment - Payment of Overtime Wages Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0664 Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Repeal Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 (HB1204) Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM