Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Overtime

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Overtime Compensation Earned by Certain Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0438 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Overtime Compensation Earned by Certain Individuals Delegate Summers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0204 Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2014 Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM