Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Overtime

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 (SB0623)
Title
Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 (SB0994)
Title
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0711)
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623 (HB0197)
Title
Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0711 (HB0721)
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994 (HB0401)
Title
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0197 (SB0623) Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2016 Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0401 (SB0994) Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - Revisions Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0721 (SB0711) Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016 Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0623 (HB0197) Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2016 Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0711 (HB0721) Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016 Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0994 (HB0401) Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - Revisions Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM