Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096 /CH0080
Title
Natural Resources - Restricted Shellfish Harvest Areas - Water Testing
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184 /CH0279 (SB0484/CH0278)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 (SB0464/CH0057)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery Permits
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0357 /CH0235 (SB0344/CH0234)
Title
Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Wood
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Harvesting - Distribution of Oyster Tags
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Environment - Water Pollution Control - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 (SB0795)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1485
Title
Oyster Sanctuaries - Oyster Bar Cleaning and Removal of Diseased Oysters
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505 /CH0689 (SB1032)
Title
Oysters - Power Dredging - Time Period
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0173
Title
Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0234 (HB0357/CH0235)
Title
Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0464 /CH0057 (HB0306)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery Permits
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 /CH0278 (HB0184/CH0279)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795 (HB1244)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0984
Title
Natural Resources - Designation of Oyster Sanctuaries - Moratorium
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1018
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Harvesting - Bulk Oyster Tags
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1032 (HB1505/CH0689)
Title
Oysters - Power Dredging - Time Period
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0096 /CH0080 Natural Resources - Restricted Shellfish Harvest Areas - Water Testing Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0184 /CH0279 (SB0484/CH0278) Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0306 (SB0464/CH0057) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery Permits Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0357 /CH0235 (SB0344/CH0234) Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and Penalty Delegate Wood 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0622 Natural Resources - Oyster Harvesting - Distribution of Oyster Tags Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Environment - Water Pollution Control - Penalties Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1244 (SB0795) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1485 Oyster Sanctuaries - Oyster Bar Cleaning and Removal of Diseased Oysters Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1505 /CH0689 (SB1032) Oysters - Power Dredging - Time Period Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 689
Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0059 /CH0173 Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0344 /CH0234 (HB0357/CH0235) Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and Penalty Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0464 /CH0057 (HB0306) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery Permits Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0484 /CH0278 (HB0184/CH0279) Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling Senator Dyson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0795 (HB1244) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0984 Natural Resources - Designation of Oyster Sanctuaries - Moratorium Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1018 Natural Resources - Oyster Harvesting - Bulk Oyster Tags Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1032 (HB1505/CH0689) Oysters - Power Dredging - Time Period Senator Colburn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM