Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618 (SB0437)
Title
Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0753 (SB0759)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Oyster House Project
Sponsor
Delegate Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 (SB0466)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1551 (SB1111)
Title
Natural Resources - Fresh Oyster Shells - Purchase by County Oyster Committees
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0437 (HB0618)
Title
Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0466 (HB1155)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0759 (HB0753)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Oyster House Project
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1111 (HB1551)
Title
Natural Resources - Fresh Oyster Shells - Purchase by County Oyster Committees
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0618 (SB0437) Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0753 (SB0759) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Oyster House Project Delegate Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0913 Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1155 (SB0466) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1551 (SB1111) Natural Resources - Fresh Oyster Shells - Purchase by County Oyster Committees Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0437 (HB0618) Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0466 (HB1155) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0759 (HB0753) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Oyster House Project Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB1111 (HB1551) Natural Resources - Fresh Oyster Shells - Purchase by County Oyster Committees Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM