Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0319 /CH0260
Title
Oysters and Clams - Dredging by Auxiliary Yawl - Authorized Boats
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0427 (SB0188)
Title
Income Tax - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0758
Title
Natural Resources - County Oyster Committees
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799 /CH0278
Title
Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918 (SB0957)
Title
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties - Gear Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 (SB0956)
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205
Title
Oyster Advisory Commission - Membership and Appointments
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1527 /CH0142
Title
Environment - Water Appropriation Permit - Aquaculture Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1603 (SB0937/CH0703)
Title
Sustainable Oyster Population and Fishery Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 (HB0427)
Title
Income Tax - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937 /CH0703 (HB1603)
Title
Sustainable Oyster Population and Fishery Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0956 (HB0953)
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 (HB0918)
Title
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties - Gear Violations
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - County Oyster Committees
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0319 /CH0260 Oysters and Clams - Dredging by Auxiliary Yawl - Authorized Boats Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0427 (SB0188) Income Tax - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount Delegate Sophocleus 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0758 Natural Resources - County Oyster Committees Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0799 /CH0278 Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0918 (SB0957) Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties - Gear Violations Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2016 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0953 (SB0956) Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB1205 Oyster Advisory Commission - Membership and Appointments Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1527 /CH0142 Environment - Water Appropriation Permit - Aquaculture Exemption Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1603 (SB0937/CH0703) Sustainable Oyster Population and Fishery Act of 2016 Delegate Frush 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0188 (HB0427) Income Tax - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0937 /CH0703 (HB1603) Sustainable Oyster Population and Fishery Act of 2016 Senator Manno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0956 (HB0953) Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 (HB0918) Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties - Gear Violations Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0964 Natural Resources - Oysters - County Oyster Committees Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM