Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 /CH0603 (SB0153/CH0604)
Title
Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1137 /CH0518
Title
Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 /CH0520 (SB0558)
Title
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Tolerance for Seafood Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases and Public Shellfish Fishery Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1455
Title
Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1485 /CH0531
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 /CH0604 (HB0572/CH0603)
Title
Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB1172/CH0520)
Title
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Planting - Substrate Material
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1237
Title
Natural Resources - Public Shellfish Fishery Area - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0572 /CH0603 (SB0153/CH0604) Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension Delegate Rey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1137 /CH0518 Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 /CH0520 (SB0558) Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1174 Natural Resources - Oysters - Tolerance for Seafood Dealers Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1426 Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases and Public Shellfish Fishery Areas Delegate Adams 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1455 Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals - Prohibition Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1485 /CH0531 Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners Delegate Fisher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0153 /CH0604 (HB0572/CH0603) Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 (HB1172/CH0520) Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0926 Natural Resources - Oyster Planting - Substrate Material Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1237 Natural Resources - Public Shellfish Fishery Area - Standards Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM