Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856 (SB0689)
Title
Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases and Water Column Leases - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 /CH0597 (SB0808/CH0598)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285 (SB0678)
Title
Natural Resources - Reclassification of Oyster Sanctuaries - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1434
Title
Aquaculture Leases – Marking Requirements and Use of Lease – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1498
Title
Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Revocation
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 (SJ0003)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing - Wild-Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0437
Title
Prohibition of Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals
Sponsor
Baltimore County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678 (HB1285)
Title
Natural Resources - Reclassification of Oyster Sanctuaries - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 (HB0856)
Title
Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases and Water Column Leases - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808 /CH0598 (HB0911/CH0597)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Oyster Authorizations - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0003)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0856 (SB0689) Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases and Water Column Leases - Penalties Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 /CH0597 (SB0808/CH0598) Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1285 (SB0678) Natural Resources - Reclassification of Oyster Sanctuaries - Authorization Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1353 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1434 Aquaculture Leases – Marking Requirements and Use of Lease – Alterations Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1498 Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Revocation Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HJ0003 (SJ0003) Natural Resources - Fishing - Wild-Caught Blue Catfish Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0437 Prohibition of Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals Baltimore County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0678 (HB1285) Natural Resources - Reclassification of Oyster Sanctuaries - Authorization Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0689 (HB0856) Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases and Water Column Leases - Penalties Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0808 /CH0598 (HB0911/CH0597) Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0948 Natural Resources - Commercial Oyster Authorizations - Requirements Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SJ0003 (HJ0003) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/29/2020 5:30 PM