Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 (SB0444/CH0350)
Title
Public Records - Inspection
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 /CH0398
Title
Annotated Code of Maryland - Captions and Catchlines - Interpretation
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0611)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264
Title
Open Meetings Act - Public Body - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305
Title
Administrative Procedure Act - Limitation on Adoption of Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353 (SB0094/CH0149)
Title
State Government - Automated Mapping-Geographic Information Systems - System Services Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0674 /CH0266 (SB0852)
Title
Public Information Act - List of Contact Information for Governmental Unit Representatives
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755 /CH0136 (SB0695/CH0135)
Title
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867
Title
Public Information Act - State Public Information Act Compliance Board and State Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 /CH0137 (SB0775)
Title
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small Businesses
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977 (SB0779)
Title
State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Investigatory File and Record of Proceeding
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 (SB0713)
Title
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251
Title
General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Required Training
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0149 (HB0353)
Title
State Government - Automated Mapping-Geographic Information Systems - System Services Costs
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 /CH0350 (HB0083)
Title
Public Records - Inspection
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0611 (HB0162)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 /CH0135 (HB0755/CH0136)
Title
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0713 (HB0989)
Title
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775 (HB0939/CH0137)
Title
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small Businesses
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0779 (HB0977)
Title
State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Investigatory File and Record of Proceeding
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852 (HB0674/CH0266)
Title
Public Information Act - List of Contact Information for Governmental Unit Representatives
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 (SB0444/CH0350) Public Records - Inspection Delegate Krebs 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2015 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0084 /CH0398 Annotated Code of Maryland - Captions and Catchlines - Interpretation Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2015 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0162 (SB0611) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0264 Open Meetings Act - Public Body - Definition Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0305 Administrative Procedure Act - Limitation on Adoption of Regulations Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0353 (SB0094/CH0149) State Government - Automated Mapping-Geographic Information Systems - System Services Costs Delegate Cullison 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0674 /CH0266 (SB0852) Public Information Act - List of Contact Information for Governmental Unit Representatives Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0755 /CH0136 (SB0695/CH0135) General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0867 Public Information Act - State Public Information Act Compliance Board and State Policy Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 /CH0137 (SB0775) Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small Businesses Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Economic Matters
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
HB0977 (SB0779) State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Investigatory File and Record of Proceeding Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0989 (SB0713) State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1251 General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Required Training Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0094 /CH0149 (HB0353) State Government - Automated Mapping-Geographic Information Systems - System Services Costs Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0444 /CH0350 (HB0083) Public Records - Inspection Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0611 (HB0162) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0695 /CH0135 (HB0755/CH0136) General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0713 (HB0989) State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.
Rules
3/05/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0775 (HB0939/CH0137) Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small Businesses President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0779 (HB0977) State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Investigatory File and Record of Proceeding Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0852 (HB0674/CH0266) Public Information Act - List of Contact Information for Governmental Unit Representatives Senator Young 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0854 State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM