Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136 (SB0314)
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0157 (SB0173)
Title
State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0215 (SB0005/CH0297)
Title
Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321
Title
State Government - Written Policies for Public Communications - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413 (SB0979)
Title
Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Formal Complaints Against Public Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658 /CH0682 (SB0755/CH0683)
Title
Interagency Agreements – Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0927
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission – Training Requirements – Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403 (SB0741/CH0334)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Properties Subject to Historic Preservation Easements - Waiver Process
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005 /CH0297 (HB0215)
Title
Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0055 /CH0144
Title
Department of Planning - Central Depository
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0157)
Title
State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314 (HB0136)
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678 /CH0407
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 /CH0334 (HB1403)
Title
Secretary of Planning – Adaptive Reuse of Historic Properties – Study
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0683 (HB0658/CH0682)
Title
Interagency Agreements – Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0838
Title
Maryland Public Information Act - Personnel Records of Law Enforcement Officers - Inspections by Investigative Agencies
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963
Title
Public Information Act - Workers' Compensation Commission - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979 (HB0413)
Title
Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Formal Complaints Against Public Employees
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0136 (SB0314) Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019) Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (93-40)
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0157 (SB0173) State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0215 (SB0005/CH0297) Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record Delegate Jackson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0321 State Government - Written Policies for Public Communications - Revisions Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0413 (SB0979) Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Formal Complaints Against Public Employees Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0658 /CH0682 (SB0755/CH0683) Interagency Agreements – Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Reporting Requirements Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 682
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0927 Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission – Training Requirements – Firearms Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB1403 (SB0741/CH0334) Maryland Historical Trust - Properties Subject to Historic Preservation Easements - Waiver Process Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0005 /CH0297 (HB0215) Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2019 - 4:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0055 /CH0144 Department of Planning - Central Depository Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/10/2019 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0173 (HB0157) State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0314 (HB0136) Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019) Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-40)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0678 /CH0407 State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0741 /CH0334 (HB1403) Secretary of Planning – Adaptive Reuse of Historic Properties – Study Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 /CH0683 (HB0658/CH0682) Interagency Agreements – Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Reporting Requirements Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 683
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0838 Maryland Public Information Act - Personnel Records of Law Enforcement Officers - Inspections by Investigative Agencies Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0963 Public Information Act - Workers' Compensation Commission - Denial of Part of a Public Record Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0979 (HB0413) Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Formal Complaints Against Public Employees Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM