Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 (SB0166)
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0610
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678 (SB0478)
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0806
Title
General Assembly - Vacancies - Special Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
General Assembly - Filling of Vacancy
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0001
Title
Number and Terms of United States Supreme Court Justices
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 (SJ0003)
Title
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043
Title
State Government - Governor - Approval of Duplicative Bills
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161
Title
General Assembly - Legislators' Right to Vote Act
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 (HB0604)
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0222 /CH0021
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 /CH0022
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0478 (HB0678)
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836
Title
General Assembly - Name Submitted by Central Committee to Fill Vacancy - Required Appointment by Governor
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0008)
Title
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Rules
HB0604 (SB0166) General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0610 Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0678 (SB0478) General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0806 General Assembly - Vacancies - Special Elections Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1070 General Assembly - Filling of Vacancy Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Ways and Means
HJ0001 Number and Terms of United States Supreme Court Justices Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HJ0008 (SJ0003) Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
SB0043 State Government - Governor - Approval of Duplicative Bills Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0099 Congressional Districting Process Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0161 General Assembly - Legislators' Right to Vote Act Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0166 (HB0604) General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0222 /CH0021 Annual Curative Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Rules
2/11/2015 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0223 /CH0022 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Rules
2/11/2015 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0478 (HB0678) General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.
Rules
3/05/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0814 Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0836 General Assembly - Name Submitted by Central Committee to Fill Vacancy - Required Appointment by Governor Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SJ0003 (HJ0008) Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM