Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130
Title
Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of Report (General Assembly Online Social Calendar)
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168 (SB0576)
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Office of Information Systems - Video and Audio Recordings
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316
Title
General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 /CH0261
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System Audits
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0411 /CH0104
Title
General Assembly - Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 (SB0375)
Title
Relief From Budget Mandates
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209
Title
General Assembly - Limitation of Terms
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370
Title
General Assembly - Limitation on Introduction of Bills
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 (SJ0004)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004 (SJ0003)
Title
United States Congress - Call to Congress and the President to Act on Redistricting Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0005)
Title
Constitutional Convention - Amendment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 (HB0449)
Title
Relief From Budget Mandates
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0467
Title
General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0506 /CH0008
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507 /CH0009
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0168)
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628
Title
General Assembly Standing Committees - Recorded Votes and Written Testimony
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0004)
Title
United States Congress - Call to Congress and the President to Act on Redistricting Reform
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0003)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005 (HJ0006)
Title
Constitutional Convention - Amendment - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements Speaker 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/02/2016 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0130 Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of Report (General Assembly Online Social Calendar) Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0168 (SB0576) General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0308 Department of Legislative Services - Office of Information Systems - Video and Audio Recordings Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0316 General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 /CH0261 Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System Audits Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0411 /CH0104 General Assembly - Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Membership Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0449 (SB0375) Relief From Budget Mandates Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1209 General Assembly - Limitation of Terms Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1370 General Assembly - Limitation on Introduction of Bills Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0003 (SJ0004) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HJ0004 (SJ0003) United States Congress - Call to Congress and the President to Act on Redistricting Reform Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HJ0006 (SJ0005) Constitutional Convention - Amendment - Repeal Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0375 (HB0449) Relief From Budget Mandates President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0467 General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0474 Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0506 /CH0008 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Rules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0507 /CH0009 Annual Curative Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Rules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB0168) General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Rules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 AM
SB0628 General Assembly Standing Committees - Recorded Votes and Written Testimony Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0003 (HJ0004) United States Congress - Call to Congress and the President to Act on Redistricting Reform Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0004 (HJ0003) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0005 (HJ0006) Constitutional Convention - Amendment - Repeal Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM