Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Parking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 (SB0264)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0531 (SB0600/CH0530)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 (SB1073)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - F. Scott Fitzgerald Theater ADA Parking and Access Improvements
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Unlawful Drinking or Possessing an Open Container - Failure to Appear in Court
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1020
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Murphy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103
Title
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 (HB0312)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition
Sponsor
Baltimore City Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548 /CH0521
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Festival) Beer, Wine and Liquor Permit
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1073 (HB0744)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - F. Scott Fitzgerald Theater ADA Parking and Access Improvements
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0312 (SB0264) Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0742 /CH0531 (SB0600/CH0530) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0744 (SB1073) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - F. Scott Fitzgerald Theater ADA Parking and Access Improvements Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 11:00 AM
HB0964 Alcoholic Beverages - Unlawful Drinking or Possessing an Open Container - Failure to Appear in Court Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1020 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Murphy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
SB0264 (HB0312) Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition Baltimore City Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0548 /CH0521 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Festival) Beer, Wine and Liquor Permit Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1073 (HB0744) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - F. Scott Fitzgerald Theater ADA Parking and Access Improvements Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM