Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Parking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036 (SB0302)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0098 (SB0069)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Loopers Field Improvement Project
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 (SB0301)
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1455
Title
Highway Parking - Prohibition Against Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136
Title
Vehicle Laws - Parking Violations - Authority of Political Subdivisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0301 (HB0699)
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0302 (HB0036)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0036 (SB0302) Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0098 (SB0069) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Loopers Field Improvement Project Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Appropriations
HB0699 (SB0301) Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1043 Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1455 Highway Parking - Prohibition Against Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0136 Vehicle Laws - Parking Violations - Authority of Political Subdivisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Lee)
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0301 (HB0699) Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0302 (HB0036) Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM