Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Parking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088 /CH0578
Title
Criminal Law and Civil Offenses – Classifications
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0393 /CH0470
Title
Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 (SB0612)
Title
Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment (Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225 (SB0266)
Title
Parking for Individuals With Disabilities - Continuing Care Retirement Facility - Time Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 /CH0737
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 (HB1225)
Title
Parking for Individuals With Disabilities – Continuing Care Retirement Facility – Time Limitation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0316
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 (HB0709)
Title
Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Electric Vehicle Charging Infrastructure
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0088 /CH0578 Criminal Law and Civil Offenses – Classifications Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 578
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0393 /CH0470 Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0709 (SB0612) Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0826 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment (Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1225 (SB0266) Parking for Individuals With Disabilities - Continuing Care Retirement Facility - Time Limitation Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1347 /CH0737 Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2019 - 12:45 PM
SB0266 (HB1225) Parking for Individuals With Disabilities – Continuing Care Retirement Facility – Time Limitation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0316 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0612 (HB0709) Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0987 Public Safety - Building Codes - Electric Vehicle Charging Infrastructure Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM